Our oldest three kids went through the government schools. The first escaped this insane method and learned it the way we did back in the dark ages. The middle two got caught up in this. We didn’t take them out. Hindsight.
The youngest two have never set foot in in a government school. We were slow learners but we learned.
So your inability to multiply 10 x 30 proves that they’re dumb, and adding the coffee maker video makes them even dumber because all the kids have to make coffee in class, or something.
The coffeemaker vid was a joke by the guy who solved it in seconds, and even had time to make a coffee while the teacher showed her long-ass method of how to do it.
imnobody00
July 27, 2021 at 1:35 am
Dragoonia, you went to public school or “woke” private school, right? Your complete inability to understand a simple video narrative is not normal in people that aren’t mentally handicapped. It can only be the result of years and years of indoctrination and dissociative thinking in woke schools. I have not seen something like this even with the dumbest of dumb people.
Next time, before making a fool of yourself, ask a friend to interpret the video for you. You’re welcome.
okguy
July 26, 2021 at 5:58 pm
Does anyone really believe that Shaquinta will find that easier? Just call math rayciss and leave it at that.There are cuniform clay math tablets that go back to 3,000 b.c. Mesopotamia, but this is the first time anyone has seen this crazy s…There are also hints that they were doing calculus on those mud pies,but that was then and this is now.
Yeah, supposedly the Mayans were doing calculus, even ordinary differential equations… Fat lot of good that did them without gunpowder and the wheel, against the Spaniards, but anyway… 😉
Tom S
July 26, 2021 at 7:27 pm
35*12=(30+5)*12=360+60=420
Or
35*12=(70/2)*12=70*6=420
ZP, your approach is NOT simpler or clever. It is similar to the common shortcut
(a+b)*(a-b)=a^2-b^2. I think you’re just trying to seem clever. (He knows algebra!)
You all should have seen that rectangle explanation in algebra when learning why
(a+b)*(c+d)=a*c+a*d+b*c+b*d, or even to explain (to the smarter kids in class) why the old method of multiplying multidigit numbers worked. To make that rectangle the algorithm for “how to do the problem” is insane. It is more abstract than the old method.
Did anyone else scream when she did 30*10 as “3 times 1 is 3, and then count the zeros?
fuzziewuzziebear
July 26, 2021 at 7:38 pm
Don’t let feminists teach math! We have to get men back into education. There is a reason that math is the Queen of the Sciences. It is at the foundation.
Male math teachers, and as curricula writers, are one solution to this dilemma. Interesting seeing all the clever alternatives. It was an easy problem that the curriculum made hard, I believe, on purpose.
If they were truly interested in simplifying it by breaking it into parts why not do so without the boxes and grid art and nonsense? Why not just say:
(30×10)+(30×2)+(5×10)+(5×2)=420
I’m sure, for instance, that the kids already knew that 35 is 30+5 since they were working on 2-digit multiplication. A large part of the problem is treating kids like idiots by repeatedly stating the obvious.
Publik skoolz have been needlessly complicating not only math, but simple arithmetic for nearly sixty years, if not longer. The difference “back in the day” was that teachers, for the most part, were not the Epsilon Simi-morons (thank you, Aldous Huxley) that they are today.
Seriously, you have to put SERIOUS EFFORT into making simple math this complicated.
jorgen b
July 26, 2021 at 3:30 pm
Is this how the Chinese did it before Euclid was born or something? Pythagoras would have this woman sacrificed to the gods for this.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:15 pm
lol
Hun
July 26, 2021 at 3:31 pm
Who comes up with this stupid crap and why?
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:15 pm
¯\_(ツ)_/¯
electricangel
July 26, 2021 at 4:31 pm
Her method will work, but it’s needlessly complex. Argh.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:15 pm
Yes.
Elspeth
July 26, 2021 at 4:45 pm
Our oldest three kids went through the government schools. The first escaped this insane method and learned it the way we did back in the dark ages. The middle two got caught up in this. We didn’t take them out. Hindsight.
The youngest two have never set foot in in a government school. We were slow learners but we learned.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:16 pm
🙂
zerothposition
July 26, 2021 at 5:00 pm
(a+b+1)(a-b) = a^2-b^2+a-b
Set a=23, b=11
529-121+23-11=420
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:16 pm
420, so it’s stoner math. 😉
Dragoonia Welp
July 26, 2021 at 5:04 pm
So your inability to multiply 10 x 30 proves that they’re dumb, and adding the coffee maker video makes them even dumber because all the kids have to make coffee in class, or something.
And we wonder why conservatives lose.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 5:17 pm
The coffeemaker vid was a joke by the guy who solved it in seconds, and even had time to make a coffee while the teacher showed her long-ass method of how to do it.
imnobody00
July 27, 2021 at 1:35 am
Dragoonia, you went to public school or “woke” private school, right? Your complete inability to understand a simple video narrative is not normal in people that aren’t mentally handicapped. It can only be the result of years and years of indoctrination and dissociative thinking in woke schools. I have not seen something like this even with the dumbest of dumb people.
Next time, before making a fool of yourself, ask a friend to interpret the video for you. You’re welcome.
okguy
July 26, 2021 at 5:58 pm
Does anyone really believe that Shaquinta will find that easier? Just call math rayciss and leave it at that.There are cuniform clay math tablets that go back to 3,000 b.c. Mesopotamia, but this is the first time anyone has seen this crazy s…There are also hints that they were doing calculus on those mud pies,but that was then and this is now.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 6:22 pm
Yeah, supposedly the Mayans were doing calculus, even ordinary differential equations… Fat lot of good that did them without gunpowder and the wheel, against the Spaniards, but anyway… 😉
Tom S
July 26, 2021 at 7:27 pm
35*12=(30+5)*12=360+60=420
Or
35*12=(70/2)*12=70*6=420
ZP, your approach is NOT simpler or clever. It is similar to the common shortcut
(a+b)*(a-b)=a^2-b^2. I think you’re just trying to seem clever. (He knows algebra!)
You all should have seen that rectangle explanation in algebra when learning why
(a+b)*(c+d)=a*c+a*d+b*c+b*d, or even to explain (to the smarter kids in class) why the old method of multiplying multidigit numbers worked. To make that rectangle the algorithm for “how to do the problem” is insane. It is more abstract than the old method.
Did anyone else scream when she did 30*10 as “3 times 1 is 3, and then count the zeros?
fuzziewuzziebear
July 26, 2021 at 7:38 pm
Don’t let feminists teach math! We have to get men back into education. There is a reason that math is the Queen of the Sciences. It is at the foundation.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 7:39 pm
Yeah.
Elspeth
July 26, 2021 at 8:14 pm
Male math teachers, and as curricula writers, are one solution to this dilemma. Interesting seeing all the clever alternatives. It was an easy problem that the curriculum made hard, I believe, on purpose.
If they were truly interested in simplifying it by breaking it into parts why not do so without the boxes and grid art and nonsense? Why not just say:
(30×10)+(30×2)+(5×10)+(5×2)=420
I’m sure, for instance, that the kids already knew that 35 is 30+5 since they were working on 2-digit multiplication. A large part of the problem is treating kids like idiots by repeatedly stating the obvious.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 9:48 pm
I get the impression these teachers are more concerned with showing how clever they are than that their charges actually learn anything useful…
feeriker
July 26, 2021 at 9:11 pm
Publik skoolz have been needlessly complicating not only math, but simple arithmetic for nearly sixty years, if not longer. The difference “back in the day” was that teachers, for the most part, were not the Epsilon Simi-morons (thank you, Aldous Huxley) that they are today.
Seriously, you have to put SERIOUS EFFORT into making simple math this complicated.
Will S.
July 26, 2021 at 9:49 pm
Right?
It’s like the Rube Goldberg method of math, lol.